House | 03/18/2025 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Reported out of Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Favorable by Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Added to Commerce Committee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2025 | Now in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2025 | Reported out of Industries & Professional Activities Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Favorable by Industries & Professional Activities Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Added to Industries & Professional Activities Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Now in Industries & Professional Activities Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Referred to Industries & Professional Activities Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Filed |