House
|
05/03/2025
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2025)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Reported out of Civil Justice & Claims Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Favorable by Civil Justice & Claims Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Added to Civil Justice & Claims Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Now in Civil Justice & Claims Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Reported out of Industries & Professional Activities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Favorable by Industries & Professional Activities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Added to Industries & Professional Activities Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Now in Industries & Professional Activities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Referred to Civil Justice & Claims Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Referred to Industries & Professional Activities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|