Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
CS passed; YEAS 107, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2025)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Reported out of Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Favorable with CS by Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Added to Budget Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Now in Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Referred to Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Reported out of Civil Justice & Claims Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice & Claims Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Added to Civil Justice & Claims Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2025
|
Now in Civil Justice & Claims Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2025
|
Referred to Civil Justice & Claims Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|