House | 04/29/2025 | Laid on Table, refer to SB 7000 | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Reported out of State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Favorable by State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Now in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Reported out of Natural Resources & Disasters Subcommittee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Favorable by Natural Resources & Disasters Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | Added to Natural Resources & Disasters Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Now in Natural Resources & Disasters Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Referred to Natural Resources & Disasters Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Filed |