House | 04/29/2025 | Laid on Table, refer to SB 7020 | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | CS Filed | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Reported out of State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Now in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Filed |