Florida 2025 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0318 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 23, 2025
Analysis April 21, 2025
Analysis April 16, 2025
Analysis April 14, 2025
Analysis February 19, 2025
Analysis February 17, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 16, 2025