House
|
04/29/2025
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/22/25, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/15/25, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/25/25, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Referred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|