Senate | 03/26/2025 | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/25/25, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Now in Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/11/25, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Commerce and Tourism; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Filed |