Florida 2025 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0806 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 1, 2025
Analysis March 31, 2025
Analysis March 25, 2025
Analysis March 21, 2025
Analysis March 12, 2025
Analysis March 11, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill March 12, 2025