Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1103
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 1103
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/22/25, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 04/15/25, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/01/25, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|