Florida 2025 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1102 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 18, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 17, 2025
Analysis April 16, 2025
Analysis April 10, 2025
Analysis April 9, 2025
Analysis March 18, 2025
Analysis March 14, 2025