Senate | 03/19/2025 | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/17/25, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Filed |