LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2025 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S1244
Action History
FL
Florida Senate Bill S1244
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1244
Action History
Senate
03/11/2025
Now in Finance and Tax
Senate
03/10/2025
Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
Senate
03/05/2025
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/10/25, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
Senate
03/04/2025
Introduced
Senate
03/03/2025
Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
Senate
02/25/2025
Filed