Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
CS failed to pass; YEAS 23 NAYS 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Amendment(s) failed (673850)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Amendment(s) adopted (589524, 929710)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 21 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/16/25, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Remaining references corrected to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Original reference(s) removed: Governmental Oversight and Accountability
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/01/25, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|