Senate | 03/26/2025 | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/19/25, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Filed |