Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1161
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 1161
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Retained on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/15/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 24 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/08/25, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/01/25, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Now in Criminal Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/17/25, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Criminal Justice; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|