Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1353
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Substituted CS/HB 1353
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/16/25, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 04/10/25, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/01/25, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|