Senate | 05/03/2025 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/31/25, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Filed |