Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1099
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Substituted CS/HB 1099
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/21/25, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/15/25, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Remaining references corrected to Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Original reference(s) removed: Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/01/25, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|