Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/21/25, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/15/25, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/25/25, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|