Senate | 05/03/2025 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 04/17/2025 | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/22/25, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/21/25, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --If Received | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/17/25, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/31/25, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Fiscal Policy; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Filed |