Senate | 03/26/2025 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 03/31/25, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Now in Education Pre-K - 12 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/18/25, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Education Pre-K - 12; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Filed |