Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/29/2025)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
In Possession List
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/27/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 25 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/19/25, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/11/25, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2025
|
Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Regulated Industries; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/18/25, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
Submitted for consideration by Regulated Industries
|
|
|