Florida 2025 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7020 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 19, 2025

Analysis

Analysis March 26, 2025
Analysis March 25, 2025
Analysis March 19, 2025
Analysis March 17, 2025

Prefiled

Bill March 13, 2025