12/18/2023 | Effective Date 2023-12-18 | |||
12/18/2023 | Act 6 EX | |||
Senate | 12/18/2023 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 12/07/2023 | Senate Sent to Governor | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | House Passed/Adopted | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 12/04/2023 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 12/04/2023 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 11/30/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | Senate Hopper |