Senate | 03/20/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House Passed/Adopted | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | House First Readers | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | House Hopper |