Senate | 03/04/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | House Passed/Adopted | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | House First Readers | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | House Hopper |