05/06/2024 | Effective Date 2024-05-06 | |||
05/06/2024 | Act 650 | |||
House | 05/06/2024 | House Date Signed by Governor | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | House Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | House Passed/Adopted | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | House First Readers | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House Hopper |