04/22/2024 | Effective Date 2024-07-01 | |||
04/22/2024 | Act 413 | |||
House | 04/22/2024 | House Date Signed by Governor | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | House Sent to Governor | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Taken from Table | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Tabled | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | House First Readers | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | House Hopper |