04/13/2023 | Effective Date 2023-07-01 | |||
04/13/2023 | Act 7 | |||
House | 04/13/2023 | House Date Signed by Governor | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | House Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | House Passed/Adopted | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | House First Readers | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | House Hopper |