05/01/2023 | Effective Date 2023-05-01 | |||
05/01/2023 | Act 111 | |||
House | 05/01/2023 | House Date Signed by Governor | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | House Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | House Passed/Adopted | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | House First Readers | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | House Hopper |