04/22/2024 | Effective Date 2024-07-01 | |||
04/22/2024 | Act 389 | |||
House | 04/22/2024 | House Date Signed by Governor | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | House Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Senate Recommitted | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Senate Taken from Table | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Senate Tabled | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | House Passed/Adopted | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | House First Readers | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | House Hopper |