01/31/2024 | Effective Date 2024-01-31 | |||
01/31/2024 | Act 356 | |||
House | 01/31/2024 | House Date Signed by Governor | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | House Sent to Governor | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Senate Transmitted House | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | House First Readers | ||
House | 01/13/2023 | House Hopper |