Senate | 03/07/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | House First Readers | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | House Hopper |