05/01/2024 | Effective Date 2025-01-01 | |||
05/01/2024 | Act 511 | |||
House | 05/01/2024 | House Date Signed by Governor | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | House Sent to Governor | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Taken from Table | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Tabled | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | House First Readers | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House Hopper |