Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HB504 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 3, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 21, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023