Senate | 03/29/2023 | Senate Lost | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | House Passed/Adopted | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House First Readers | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Hopper |