Senate | 03/18/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | House First Readers | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | House Hopper |