Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Tabled | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Engrossed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Senate Recommitted | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | House First Readers | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | House Hopper |