Senate | 03/08/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | House First Readers | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | House Hopper |