04/30/2024 | Effective Date 2024-07-01 | |||
04/30/2024 | Act 503 | |||
House | 04/30/2024 | House Date Signed by Governor | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | House Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Taken from Table | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Tabled | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | House First Readers | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | House Hopper |