02/29/2024 | Effective Date 2024-02-29 | |||
02/29/2024 | Act 366 | |||
House | 02/29/2024 | House Date Signed by Governor | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | House Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | House Conference Committee Report Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 18th, 51st, 19th | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House Conference Committee Appointed 155th, 47th, 170th | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House Insisted | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate Insisted | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate Transmitted House | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | House First Readers | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | House Hopper |