05/02/2024 | Effective Date 2024-07-01 | |||
05/02/2024 | Act 553 | |||
House | 05/02/2024 | House Date Signed by Governor | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | House Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Senate Taken from Table | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Tabled | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | House Passed/Adopted | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | House First Readers | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | House Hopper |