04/22/2024 | Effective Date 2024-07-01 | |||
04/22/2024 | Act 401 | |||
House | 04/22/2024 | House Date Signed by Governor | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | House Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | House Passed/Adopted | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | House First Readers | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | House Hopper |