Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HB993 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 2, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill March 19, 2024
Bill February 22, 2024
Bill February 16, 2024