House | 03/28/2024 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | House First Readers | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | House Hopper |