Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia Senate Bill SB149 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 14, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023