House | 03/05/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate Taken from Table | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate Tabled | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate Engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Senate Hopper |