05/02/2023 | Effective Date 2023-07-01 | |||
05/02/2023 | Act 243 | |||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Senate Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate Taken from Table | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate Tabled | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Senate Hopper |