04/19/2023 | Effective Date 2023-04-19 | |||
04/19/2023 | Act 17 | |||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Senate Sent to Governor | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | House Passed/Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate Taken from Table | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate Tabled | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Senate Hopper |